Revity EPC, LLC et al v. Colony Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Solar Energy EPC, LLC and Revity EPC, LLC
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00136
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Colony Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Errata)(Kennedy, Chase)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to answer or file responsive pleqading; Reset Deadlines: Colony Insurance Company answer due 5/12/2021. If Defendants file a Motion, plaintiff shall have 30 days to respond- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/28/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 Second STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Kennedy, Chase)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to file responsive pleadings; Reset Deadlines: Colony Insurance Company answer due 4/28/2021- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/26/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Kennedy, Chase)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Riley filed by Chase H. Kennedy. - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/24/2021. (McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 3/25/2021 (McGuire, Vickie).Note: Number was given in error, no document attached.
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Richard J. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1605925 ) filed by All Defendants. (Kennedy, Chase)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, Case Number KC 2021-0144. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1605086, filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in State Court Action, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Chase) (Attachment 7 replaced with flattened, signed version on 3/22/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
March 22, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revity EPC, LLC et al v. Colony Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solar Energy EPC, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas L. Nybo
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revity EPC, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas L. Nybo
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Chase H. Kennedy
Represented By: Richard J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?