Ethier v St. Joseph Long Term Disability Ins. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Jean Ethier
Defendant: ST. JOSEPH LONG TERM DISABILITY INSURANCE and UNUM INSURANCE
Case Number: 1:2021cv00163
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pamela Jean Ethier. UNUM INSURANCE waiver sent on 4/21/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Morse, Mark)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 4/13/2021 (McGuire, Vickie). Corrected Notice.
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNUM INSURANCE. (McGuire, Vickie)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Pamela Jean Ethier. (Morse, Mark)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
April 13, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1614069 ), filed by Pamela Jean Ethier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons form, #3 summons form)(Morse, Mark) Modified on 4/13/2021 (McGuire, Vickie). Note Duplicate Summons.
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1614069 ), filed by Pamela Jean Ethier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons form, #3 summons form)(Morse, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethier v St. Joseph Long Term Disability Ins. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jean Ethier
Represented By: Mark B. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. JOSEPH LONG TERM DISABILITY INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?