Bequir v. 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Bequir
Defendant: John Olinger, 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc., d/b/a AOT Global and 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc. doing business as AOT Global
Case Number: 1:2021cv00167
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Bequir. John Olinger served on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Pushee, Michael)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Bequir. 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc. served on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Pushee, Michael)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation re #1 Complaint. 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc. answer due 6/7/2021; John Olinger answer due 6/7/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/28/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Martucci on behalf of All Defendants (Martucci, Nicole)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey P. Nakasian on behalf of All Defendants (Nakasian, Stacey)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Tumolo, Gregory)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Tumolo on behalf of All Defendants (Tumolo, Gregory)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc., John Olinger. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Kevin Bequir. (Pushee, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Kevin Bequir. (Pushee, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
April 14, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1614459 ), filed by Kevin Bequir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened version on 4/14/2021) (Hicks, Alyson).
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1614459 ), filed by Kevin Bequir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bequir v. 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Olinger
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Gregory Tumolo
Represented By: Nicole J. Martucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc., d/b/a AOT Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 02 Global Chauffered Service, Inc. doing business as AOT Global
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Gregory Tumolo
Represented By: Nicole J. Martucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bequir
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Jessica A. Roberge
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?