Burke et al v. Conley et al
Plaintiff: Brian E. Burke and Lynn M. Margherio
Defendant: Second Opinion Home Inspection of New England, Inc., Nicole Maine, Colleen A. Conley and Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00181
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM COUNTS VII AND XI filed by Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd., Nicole Maine. Responses due by 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Nelson, Monica)
June 16, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd., Nicole Maine.(Nelson, Monica)
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd.. (Nelson, Monica)
June 8, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian E. Burke, Lynn M. Margherio. Colleen A. Conley served on 6/5/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Guerrera, Nicholas)
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Kenneth B. Walton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1624750 ) filed by Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd., Nicole Maine. (Nelson, Monica)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth B. Walton. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/14/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleadings; Reset Deadlines: Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd. answer or responsive pleading due 6/16/2021; Nicole Maine answer or responsive pleading due 6/16/2021 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/12/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading filed by Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd., Nicole Maine. Responses due by 5/25/2021. (Nelson, Monica)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd., Nicole Maine (Nelson, Monica)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Reissued as to Colleen A. Conley. (Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke, Lynn M. Margherio. (Guerrera, Nicholas)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian E. Burke. Second Opinion Home Inspection of New England, Inc. served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Berg, Andrew)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian E. Burke. Nicole Maine served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Berg, Andrew)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian E. Burke. Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Nicholas S. Guerrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1617814 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Nicholas S. Guerrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1617814 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, #1 Complaint . (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, #1 Complaint . (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Brian E. Burke. (Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1617750 ), filed by Brian E. Burke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1617750 ), filed by Brian E. Burke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Berg, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas S. Guerrera. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/22/2021. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas S. Guerrera. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/22/2021. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson)
April 22, 2021 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke et al v. Conley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Opinion Home Inspection of New England, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Maine
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen A. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lila Delman Real Estate, Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian E. Burke
Represented By: Nicholas S. Guerrera
Represented By: Andrew H. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn M. Margherio
Represented By: Nicholas S. Guerrera
Represented By: Andrew H. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?