Gailey v. Electric Boat Corporation
Plaintiff: Brian Gailey
Defendant: Electric Boat Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00201
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/1/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Electric Boat Corporation.(Spacone, Aaron)
May 12, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Electric Boat Corporation answer due 5/27/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION to file Responsive Pleading filed by Electric Boat Corporation. (Spacone, Aaron)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1622445 ) filed by Electric Boat Corporation. (Spacone, Aaron)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Siegel. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/7/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Smith, Rana)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Smith, Rana)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Boat Corporation identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for Electric Boat Corporation.. (Spacone, Aaron)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Boat Corporation identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for Electric Boat Corporation.. (Spacone, Aaron)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron A. Spacone on behalf of Electric Boat Corporation (Spacone, Aaron)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron A. Spacone on behalf of Electric Boat Corporation (Spacone, Aaron)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2021-0112. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1622137, filed by Electric Boat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spacone, Aaron)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2021-0112. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1622137, filed by Electric Boat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spacone, Aaron)
May 6, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Smith, Rana)
May 6, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Smith, Rana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gailey v. Electric Boat Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gailey
Represented By: Frederic A. Marzilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Boat Corporation
Represented By: Aaron A. Spacone
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?