Silvia v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Defendant: Patricia Silvia
Case Number: 1:2021cv00217
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association for Summons Patricia Silvia served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Eastwood, Catherine)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Patricia Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank Trust National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Inc. for U.S. Bank Trust National Association.. (Eastwood, Catherine)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by U.S. Bank Trust National Association of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (Eastwood, Catherine)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1625895 ), filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, is a national bank chartered and existing under the laws of the United States of America serving not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee for VR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Note, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - AOM1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - AOM2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Loan Modification, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Default Notices, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Payment History, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Acceleration Notices)(Eastwood, Catherine)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1625895 ), filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, is a national bank chartered and existing under the laws of the United States of America serving not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee for VR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Note, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit 3 - AOM1, #5 Exhibit 4 - AOM2, #6 Exhibit 5 - Loan Modification, #7 Exhibit 6 - Default Notices, #8 Exhibit 7 - Payment History, #9 Exhibit 8 - Acceleration Notices)(Eastwood, Catherine)
May 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Catherine V. Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?