CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. et al v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company and CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc.
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00223
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION for Five-Day Extension To File Answers to Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by All Defendants. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00236-WES-PAS, 1:20-cv-00458-WES-PAS, 1:20-cv-00507-WES-PAS, 1:20-cv-00520-WES-PAS, 1:21-cv-00223-WES-PAS(Corrente, Robert)
July 19, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/2/2021. (Jenner, Christian)
July 19, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 1:20-cv-00236-WES-PAS. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting (48) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00236-WES-PAS; granting (41) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (42) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00458-WES-PAS; granting (38) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (39) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00507-WES-PAS; granting (35) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (36) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00520-WES-PAS; granting (24) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:21-cv-00223-WES-PAS. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/19/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Grant A. Geyerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1636107 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Corrente, Robert)
June 21, 2021 Reset Deadlines: CVS Health Corporation answer due 7/30/2021; CVS Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 7/30/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Grant Andrew Geyerman. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/21/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Craig D. Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1635420 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Corrente, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Enu A. Mainigi to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1635419 ) filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Corrente, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Enu A. Mainigiorrente ; and granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig D. Singer filed by Robert Clark Corrente. - So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/17/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
June 10, 2021 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION To Extend Time To File Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Corrente, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clark Corrente on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Corrente, Robert)
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc.. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Jenner, Christian)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc.. CVS Health Corporation served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Jenner, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Robert B. Gilmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1628257 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jenner, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Michael A. Petrino to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1628254 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jenner, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Shawna C. Bray to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1628248 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jenner, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Jed Wulfekotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1628236 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jenner, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jed Wulfekotte, ; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shawna C. Bray ; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Petrino; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert B. Gilmore. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/26/2021. (Hicks, Alyson)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina for BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina for BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HMO Louisiana, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana for HMO Louisiana, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HMO Louisiana, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana for HMO Louisiana, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(McGuire, Vickie)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Corporate Parent Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. for CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Corporate Parent Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. for CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CareFirst, Inc. for Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CareFirst, Inc. for Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CareFirst, Inc. for CareFirst of Maryland, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CareFirst, Inc. for CareFirst of Maryland, Inc... (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc., CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc., CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc., CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc., CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1626663 ), filed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1626663 ), filed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenner, Christian)
May 21, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)
May 21, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. et al v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Craig D. Singer
Represented By: Enu A. Mainigi
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Craig D. Singer
Represented By: Enu A. Mainigi
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Christian R Jenner
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Jed Wulfekotte
Represented By: Michael A. Petrino
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Shawna C. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Christian R Jenner
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Jed Wulfekotte
Represented By: Michael A. Petrino
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Shawna C. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christian R Jenner
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Jed Wulfekotte
Represented By: Michael A. Petrino
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Shawna C. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Christian R Jenner
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Jed Wulfekotte
Represented By: Michael A. Petrino
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Shawna C. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina
Represented By: Christian R Jenner
Represented By: Jed Wulfekotte
Represented By: Michael A. Petrino
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Shawna C. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Christian R Jenner
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Jed Wulfekotte
Represented By: Michael A. Petrino
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Shawna C. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc.
Represented By: Christian R Jenner
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Jed Wulfekotte
Represented By: Michael A. Petrino
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Shawna C. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?