Behroozi v. Chief Judge Jeremiah et al
Plaintiff: Artecia Behroozi
Defendant: Justice Debra E. Disegna, Judicial Officer John E. McCann III, Chief Judge Jeremiah and Justice D'Ambra Laureen
Case Number: 1:2021cv00237
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by Artecia Behroozi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McGuire, Vickie)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Artecia Behroozi. Responses due by 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Order - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. 3) is GRANTED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), further recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Artecia Behroozi, re #1 Complaint filed by Artecia Behroozi ( Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2021.). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/28/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 9, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Artecia Behroozi. (McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Artecia Behroozi. (McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Artecia Behroozi. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Artecia Behroozi. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behroozi v. Chief Judge Jeremiah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Debra E. Disegna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Officer John E. McCann III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Judge Jeremiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice D'Ambra Laureen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artecia Behroozi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?