Giardino et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Plaintiff: David A. Giardino and Jennifer Giardino
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 1:2021cv00238
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London answer due 7/30/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/20/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Responses due by 7/14/2021. (Brosnihan, David)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Brosnihan on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Brosnihan, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by David A. Giardino, Jennifer Giardino Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lamoureux, Brian)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Lamoureux on behalf of David A. Giardino, Jennifer Giardino (Lamoureux, Brian)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Lamoureux on behalf of David A. Giardino, Jennifer Giardino (Lamoureux, Brian)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan for all further referrals. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/4/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by David A. Giardino, Jennifer Giardino. (Lamoureux, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by David A. Giardino, Jennifer Giardino. (Lamoureux, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1630635 ), filed by David A. Giardino, Jennifer Giardino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Lamoureux, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1630635 ), filed by David A. Giardino, Jennifer Giardino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Lamoureux, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie)
June 3, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giardino et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Giardino
Represented By: Brian J. Lamoureux
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Giardino
Represented By: Brian J. Lamoureux
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: David A. Brosnihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?