Rustle & Spark, LLC v. Calyx Peak of MA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rustle & Spark, LLC
Defendant: Calyx Peak of MA, Inc., CPC - CPOG 2017 LLC, Calyx PG Holdings, LLC and Calyx Peak, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00268
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Reset Deadlines: CPC - CPOG 2017 LLC answer due 8/23/2021; Calyx PG Holdings, LLC answer due 8/23/2021; Calyx Peak of MA, Inc. answer due 8/23/2021; Calyx Peak, Inc. answer due 8/23/2021; and entering #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Jackson, Ryan)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time filed by All Defendants. (Petros, Gerald)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Rustle & Spark, LLC for Summons and Complaint Calyx Peak of MA, Inc. served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; Calyx Peak, Inc. served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Return of Service)(Chiulli, C.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 S)(Potter, Carrie)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Rustle & Spark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Form/Court Summons - Calyx PG Holdings, #2 Supplement Form/Court Summons - CPC CPOG 2017 LLC, #3 Supplement Form/Court Summons - Calyx Peak of MA, Inc.)(Chiulli, Carl)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: Corrective Docket Entry, . (Chiulli, Carl)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
June 21, 2021 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint: This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
June 21, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1635938 ), filed by Rustle & Spark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments A - G)(Chiulli, Carl)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1635938 ), filed by Rustle & Spark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments A - G)(Chiulli, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rustle & Spark, LLC v. Calyx Peak of MA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calyx Peak of MA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPC - CPOG 2017 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calyx PG Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calyx Peak, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rustle & Spark, LLC
Represented By: Carl A. Chiulli
Represented By: C. Alexander Chiulli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?