Raso v. McKee et al
Plaintiff: Robert Raso
Defendant: Laura Pisaturo, Gina M Raimondo, Jorge C. Armesto, Particia Coyne-Fague, Daniel J. McKee, Marilyn Cepeda Sanchez, Bonita Cade and Patricia Coyne-Fague
Case Number: 1:2021cv00271
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: On July 6, 2021, Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond issued a Report and Recommendation #4 , recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 , be denied. Plaintiff filed an objection to the Report and Recommendation #5 . Having carefully reviewed the relevant papers, the Court ACCEPTS the report and ADOPTS the recommendations and reasoning set forth therein. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 , is DENIED. Plaintiff is ordered to promptly pay the applicable civil case filing fee to avoid dismissal of this action without prejudice. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/16/2021. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by Robert Raso. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. 3) be DENIED, and that Plaintiff be ORDERED to promptly pay the applicable civil case filing fee to avoid dismissal of this action without prejudice. #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Raso. Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/6/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Raso. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account)(McGuire, Vickie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Raso. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account)(McGuire, Vickie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (McGuire, Vickie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (McGuire, Vickie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Robert Raso. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGuire, Vickie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Robert Raso. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGuire, Vickie)
June 24, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 24, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raso v. McKee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Pisaturo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina M Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge C. Armesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Particia Coyne-Fague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Cepeda Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonita Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Coyne-Fague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Raso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?