Fosu v. University of Rhode Island
Plaintiff: Louis Kwame Fosu
Defendant: University of Rhode Island, David M. Dooley, Donald DeHayes and Jeannette E. Riley
Case Number: 1:2021cv00279
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Responses due by 9/30/2021. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/26/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts II-VII of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Louis Kwame Fosu. Responses due by 9/8/2021. (Iafrate, Carly)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts II-VII of Plaintiff's Complaint) (Declaration of Steven M. Richard, Esq.) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: (Fully Signed Copy of 7/1/19 Appointment Letter for 2019-20 Academic Year), #2 Exhibit B: (URI's CBA with Faculty Union), #3 Exhibit C: (Copy of 5/15/20 Appointment Letter for 2020-21 Academic Year), #4 Exhibit D: (Secretary of State Record Regarding Diversity Think Tank), #5 Exhibit E: (President Dooley and Provost DeHayes 12/8/20 Communication to Plaintiff), #6 Exhibit F: (Provost DeHayes' 1/12/21 Letter to Plaintiff), #7 Exhibit G: (Provost DeHayes' 1/22/21 Memorandum to Plaintiff's Union Representative), #8 Exhibit H: (Provost DeHayes' 4/16/21 Letter to Plaintiff), #9 Exhibit I: (Provost DeHayes' 5/11/21 Letter to Plaintiff))(Richard, Steven)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts II-VII of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Richard, Steven)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5 Stipulation regarding acceptance of service for defendant- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/12/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 10, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION re: Service filed by Louis Kwame Fosu. (Iafrate, Carly)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4 Stipulation to extend time to answer or respond to Complaint; Reset Deadlines: Donald DeHayes answer due 8/16/2021; David M. Dooley answer due 8/16/2021; Jeannette E. Riley answer due 8/16/2021; University of Rhode Island answer due 8/16/2021.- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/9/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Extending up to and including August 16, 2021 for the filing of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by All Defendants. (Richard, Steven)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of All Defendants (Richard, Steven)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Jessica Sanderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1641014 ) filed by Louis Kwame Fosu. (Iafrate, Carly)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Sanderson. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/6/2021. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Smith, Rana)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1640979 ), filed by Louis Kwame Fosu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iafrate, Carly)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1640979 ), filed by Louis Kwame Fosu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iafrate, Carly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fosu v. University of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Rhode Island
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Dooley
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald DeHayes
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette E. Riley
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Kwame Fosu
Represented By: Carly B. Iafrate
Represented By: Jessica Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?