Jacavone v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Plaintiff: Marsha S. Jacavone
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv00288
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/26/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/26/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Support to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 8/30/2021. (Cloud, Rowdy)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Note (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Foreclosure Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Foreclosure Sale, #5 Exhibit E - RI Supreme Court Order entered 6/3/21, #6 Exhibit F - Possession Order entered 2/2/18)(Cloud, Rowdy)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (McGuire, Vickie)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 8/9/2021 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/14/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Federal National Mortgage Association (Withdrawal of Appearance) (Carr, Peter)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Federal National Mortgage Association (Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance) (Shea, Carson)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Responses due by 7/27/2021. (Cloud, Rowdy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rowdy M. Cloud on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Cloud, Rowdy)
July 13, 2021 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 18-81-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-03974. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1643501, filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Foreclosure Deed, #4 Exhibit C - Property Record Card, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shea, Carson)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-03974. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1643501, filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Foreclosure Deed, #4 Exhibit C - Property Record Card, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shea, Carson)
July 12, 2021 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. Related Case Number 18-cv-81-JJM-LDA. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 12, 2021 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. Related Case Number 18-cv-81-JJM-LDA. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacavone v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha S. Jacavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Peter F. Carr, II
Represented By: Carson M. Shea
Represented By: Rowdy M. Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?