Jacob Z. v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jacob Zinno
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00289
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 8/16/2021. (McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 8/2/2021 (McGuire, Vickie). Duplicate Notice.
July 26, 2021 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 8/9/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 9/14/2021 to enter an appearance and either file a dispositive motion or the Certified Administrative Record which shall be deemed an answer (general denial) to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(b)(3). (McGuire, Vickie)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/16/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacob Zinno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in forma pauperis)(Spunzo, David)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacob Zinno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in forma pauperis)(Spunzo, David)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Jacob Zinno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spunzo, David)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Jacob Zinno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spunzo, David)
July 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
July 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacob Z. v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Zinno
Represented By: David F. Spunzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?