Davis v. Coyne-Fague
Petitioner: Joshua Davis
Respondent: Particia Coyne-Fague and Patricia Coyne-Fague
Case Number: 1:2021cv00315
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Finding that the interests of justice require the appointment of counsel pursuant to 18 U.S.C. section 3006A(2)(B), as well as that, based on petitioner's circumstances as established by his motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2), he is financially unable to obtain adequate representation, the Court hereby appoints Attorney George West to represent petitioner in connection with this Section 2254 petition. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/29/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joshua Davis. Replies due by 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed Rule 5 Appendix by Patricia Coyne-Fague NOTICE: In order to view this document, you must first log in using your CMECF Filer login.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Davis v. State, C.A. No. PM-2010-4824, Decision dated Oct. 16, 2019, #2 Exhibit Davis v. State, C.A. No. PM-2010-4824, Decision dated May 18, 2020, #3 Exhibit Petition for Issuance of Writ of Certiorari (SU-2020-0186-MP), #4 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for Issuance of a Writ of Certiorari (SU-2020-0186-MP) (without exhibits), #5 Exhibit Memorandum in Opposition to Petition for Issuance of a Writ of Certiorari (SU-2020-0186-MP), #6 Exhibit Order dated June 4, 2021 (SU-2020-0186-MP))(Bush, Christopher)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Patricia Coyne-Fague. Responses due by 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket: P1-2006-02796A, #2 Exhibit Docket: SU-09-0049, #3 Exhibit Docket: PM-2010-4824, #4 Exhibit Docket: SU-13-0263, #5 Exhibit Docket: SU-2020-0186-MP)(Bush, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered directing the State of Rhode Island to respond State of Rhode Island Response due by 9/17/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/18/2021. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 16, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The petitioner paid the $5.00 filing fee on August 2, 2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/16/2021. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 3, 2021 DOCKET NOTE: Duplicates of ECF 1, 2 and 3 recived on 8/2/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joshua Davis. Responses due by 8/16/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joshua Davis. Responses due by 8/16/2021. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua Davis. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua Davis. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00.), filed by Joshua Davis. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00.), filed by Joshua Davis. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
August 2, 2021 PLRA Filing fee: $ 5.00 received - receipt number 14670025476. Total Amount Paid to date: $5.00. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 2, 2021 PLRA Filing fee: $ 5.00 received - receipt number 14670025476. Total Amount Paid to date: $5.00. (McGuire, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Coyne-Fague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Davis
Represented By: George J. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Particia Coyne-Fague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Coyne-Fague
Represented By: Christopher R. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?