SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet v. Sailing Yacht FARR 40 (Official # 1120807), its engines, spars, sails, generators, electronics, tackle, furnishings, contents, bunkers, appurtenances, etc.,
Defendant: Sailing Yacht FARR 40 (Official # 1120807), its engines, spars, sails, generators, electronics, tackle, furnishings, contents, bunkers, appurtenances, etc.,
Not Classified By Court: SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet
Case Number: 1:2021cv00317
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet identifying Corporate Parent Safe Harbor Marinas LLC for SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet.. (Fulweiler, John)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet appointed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/17/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 WARRANT IN REM Issued as to Sailing Yacht FARR 40 (Official # 1120807), its engines, spars, sails, generators, electronics, tackle, furnishings, contents, bunkers, appurtenances, etc. (Saucier, Martha)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/17/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
August 16, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem , #4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet. Responses due by 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Declaration of Proposed Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order)(Fulweiler, John)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant)(Fulweiler, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
August 5, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1651428 ), filed by SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Abstract of Title), #2 Exhibit "B" (DE Corp Filing), #3 Exhibit "C" (Invoice), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fulweiler, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1651428 ), filed by SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Abstract of Title), #2 Exhibit "B" (DE Corp Filing), #3 Exhibit "C" (Invoice), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet v. Sailing Yacht FARR 40 (Official # 1120807), its engines, spars, sails, generators, electronics, tackle, furnishings, contents, bunkers, appurtenances, etc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SHM Sakonnet, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Sakonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sailing Yacht FARR 40 (Official # 1120807), its engines, spars, sails, generators, electronics, tackle, furnishings, contents, bunkers, appurtenances, etc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?