Leone v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Jason Leone
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC agent of d/b/a Mr. Cooper and HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00323
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.(Tadesse, Krystle)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10 answer due 9/7/2021; Nationstar Mortgage, LLC answer due 9/7/2021. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/13/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10 identifying Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings PLC for HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10.. (Tadesse, Krystle)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.. (Tadesse, Krystle)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer Plead re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Responses due by 8/26/2021. (Tadesse, Krystle)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle Guillory Tadesse on behalf of HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10 (Tadesse, Krystle)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Ankrom on behalf of HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10 (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr. on behalf of HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10 (Farside, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 6, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC2019-0001. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1651978, filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - List of Foreclosures, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadesse, Krystle)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC2019-0001. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1651978, filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - List of Foreclosures, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadesse, Krystle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leone v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Leone
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC agent of d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series MLMI 2005-A10
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?