DeLaura v. Salve Regina University et al
Plaintiff: Stacey DeLaura
Defendant: Salve Regina University and Amanda Minor
Case Number: 1:2021cv00334
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Reset Deadlines: Amanda Minor answer due 10/12/2021; Salve Regina University answer due 10/12/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/21/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/30/2021. (Parker, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Salve Regina University. (Parker, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Parker on behalf of All Defendants (Parker, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Whelan on behalf of All Defendants (Whelan, Joseph)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacey DeLaura. All Plaintiffs. (Bejma, Vicki)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amanda Minor, Salve Regina University. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kenny, Meghan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
August 13, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Stacey DeLaura. (Bejma, Vicki)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Stacey DeLaura. (Bejma, Vicki)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Stacey DeLaura. (Bejma, Vicki)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Stacey DeLaura. (Bejma, Vicki)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1654018 ), filed by Stacey DeLaura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Bejma, Vicki)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1654018 ), filed by Stacey DeLaura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Bejma, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLaura v. Salve Regina University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey DeLaura
Represented By: Vicki J. Bejma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salve Regina University
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Minor
Represented By: Joseph D. Whelan
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?