Gonzalez v. Coyne-Fague et al
Plaintiff: Tony G. Gonzalez
Defendant: Patricia Coyne-Fague, Walter Duffy, Billie-Jo Gallagher, Lynn Corey, Lynda Aul and Vance Tyree
Case Number: 1:2021cv00349
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalya A. Buckler on behalf of Lynda Aul, Lynn Corey, Patricia Coyne-Fague, Walter Duffy, Billie-Jo Gallagher, Vance Tyree (Buckler, Natalya)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Acceptance of Service filed by Lynda Aul, Billie-Jo Gallagher, Walter Duffy, Vance Tyree, Patricia Coyne-Fague, Lynn Corey. Lynda Aul served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021; Billie-Jo Gallagher served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021; Walter Duffy served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021; Vance Tyree served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021; Patricia Coyne-Fague served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021; Lynn Corey served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. (Buckler, Natalya)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 PLRA Filing fee: $ 45.67 received - receipt number 14670025661. Total Amount Paid to date: $45.67. (Kenny, Meghan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE: The Court has granted IFP status and ordered the complaint to be served. Pursuant to the Agreement on Service between the U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island and the Rhode Island Attorney General, this Notice constitutes service as directed by the Court. Within 30 days, the RI Attorney General shall file a Notice of Acceptance of Service or a Notice of Declination of Service or both if necessary on behalf of the defendant(s) named in the complaint. # Please click here to access the Acceptance of Service form or # Please click here to access the Declination of Service form .Notice of Acceptance or Declination of Service due by 10/4/2021. (Kenny, Meghan)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF #2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff, however, is still required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. He must pay, when funds exist, an initial filing fee of the greater of 20% of the averagemonthly deposits to his account or the average monthly balance for the six months prior to the filing of his complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Subsequently, he must pay monthly 20% of the previous months income credited to his account. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The monthly deposits to Plaintiffs account during the relevant period averaged $66.85. During the same period, his average monthly balance was $228.40. Therefore, Plaintiff is required to pay $45.68 as an initial filing fee. The ACI is directed to forward to the Court each month 20% of the income credited to Plaintiffs account every time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until he has paid the entire filing fee of $350.00. Plaintiff shall make his initial payment within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 8/31/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tony G. Gonzalez. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (DaCruz, Kayla).
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tony G. Gonzalez. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (DaCruz, Kayla).
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Tony G. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Memorandum, #4 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Tony G. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Memorandum, #4 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
August 26, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
August 26, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Coyne-Fague et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony G. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Coyne-Fague
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Duffy
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie-Jo Gallagher
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Corey
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Aul
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Tyree
Represented By: Natalya A. Buckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?