SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett v. Collins
Plaintiff: SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett
Defendant: Alexander J. Collins
Case Number: 1:2021cv00354
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for an Extension of Time Motion to Extend the Time by Which Defendant Alexander J. Collins may have to Respond to the Complaint . Reset Deadlines: Alexander J. Collins answer due 12/7/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/15/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for an Extension of Time Motion to Extend the Time by Which Defendant Alexander J. Collins may have to Respond to the Complaint filed by SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett. Responses due by 10/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Proposed Stip and Order))(Fulweiler, John)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett. Alexander J. Collins served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Fulweiler, John)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett identifying Corporate Parent Safe Harbor Marinas LLC for SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett.. (Fulweiler, John)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie)
August 31, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 9/1/2021 (McGuire, Vickie).
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1661682 ), filed by SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Invoices), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett v. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHM Cowesett, LLC d/b/a Safe Harbor Cowesett
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?