Rivers v. Nice Recovery Systems LLC et al
Plaintiff: Clifton Rivers
Defendant: Nice Recovery Systems LLC, Vanguard Medical LLC, Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc. and Douglas Glod
Case Number: 1:2021cv00367
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc..(Carr, Angela)
November 4, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Douglas Glod.(Carr, Angela)
November 2, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clifton Rivers.(DeLuca, Amato)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT Order Entering #21 STIPULATION. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/29/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
October 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants answer due by 11/15/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION filed by Vanguard Medical LLC. (Pettey, Kristin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Pettey on behalf of Vanguard Medical LLC (Pettey, Kristin)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due on 11/9/2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/21/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
October 20, 2021 Filing 19 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Clifton Rivers. Responses due by 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Revens, Katelyn)
October 14, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifton Rivers. Vanguard Medical LLC served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (DeLuca, Amato)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nice Recovery Systems LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2021. (Kelly, Nancy)
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Kelly on behalf of Nice Recovery Systems LLC (Kelly, Nancy)
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc..(Carr, Angela)
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Douglas Glod.(Carr, Angela)
October 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Douglas Glod and Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc. answer due 10/12/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT Order Entering #13 STIPULATION. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/6/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Douglas Glod, Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc.. (DaCruz, Kayla)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela L. Carr on behalf of Douglas Glod, Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc. (DaCruz, Kayla)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison M. Geary on behalf of Douglas Glod, Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc. (DaCruz, Kayla)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifton Rivers. Nice Recovery Systems LLC served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (DeLuca, Amato)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifton Rivers. Douglas Glod served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (DeLuca, Amato)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifton Rivers. Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (DeLuca, Amato)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Douglas Glod, Nice Recovery Systems LLC, Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc., Vanguard Medical LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DaCruz, Kayla)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Clifton Rivers. (DeLuca, Amato)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Clifton Rivers. (DeLuca, Amato)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Clifton Rivers. (DeLuca, Amato)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Clifton Rivers. (DeLuca, Amato)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
September 13, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1665077 ), filed by Clifton Rivers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLuca, Amato) Modified on 9/10/2021 (Simoncelli, Michael).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Nice Recovery Systems LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Rivers
Represented By: Amato A. DeLuca
Represented By: Katelyn M. Revens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nice Recovery Systems LLC
Represented By: Nancy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Medical LLC
Represented By: Kristin Pettey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Foot Care, Inc.
Represented By: Allison M. Geary
Represented By: Angela L. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Glod
Represented By: Allison M. Geary
Represented By: Angela L. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?