Federal National Mortgage Association v. Godin et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Brad Godin, Cowesett Meadows Condominium Association, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWHEQ INC., CWHEQ REVOLVING HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2007-B, The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Benefit of Certificate Holders of the CWHEQ, Inc., CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series
Case Number: 1:2021cv00369
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. The Bank of New York Mellon served on 10/25/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint Pkg)(Eastwood, Catherine)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Cowesett Meadows Condominium Association served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021; Brad Godin served on 10/16/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 COA Service Returns, #2 Service Pkg)(Eastwood, Catherine)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Cowesett Meadows Condominium Association, Brad Godin, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Kenny, Meghan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Federal National Mortgage Association re #1 Complaint, Notice of Loss Mitigation Availability (Eastwood, Catherine)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Eastwood, Catherine)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1665648 ), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Note, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit 3 - Assignment, #5 Exhibit 4 - Demands, #6 Exhibit 5 - Pay History, #7 Exhibit 6 - Accels)(Eastwood, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Godin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Catherine V. Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Godin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowesett Meadows Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWHEQ INC., CWHEQ REVOLVING HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST, SERIES 2007-B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Benefit of Certificate Holders of the CWHEQ, Inc., CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?