Jones v. Giuttari et al.
Plaintiff: Webster Jones
Defendant: Joseph Giuttari, Hybrid Capital Group, LLC, The Fens Company, LLC, Peerless Hi Yield Realty Fund, LP and JG Family Trust
Case Number: 1:2021cv00399
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Tine on behalf of All Defendants (Tine, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order: Pursuant to LR Gen 205(a), Defendant Joseph Giuttari may represent himself pro se, but cannot represent Defendants Hybrid Capital Group, LLC, The Fens Company, LLC, Peerless Hi Yield Realty Fund, LP, and JG Family Trust pro se. Defendants Hybrid Capital Group, LLC, The Fens Company, LLC, Peerless Hi Yield Realty Fund, LP, and JG Family Trust are hereby ordered to retain counsel permitted to practice in the District of Rhode Island by November 29, 2021. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/29/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by JG Family Trust.(DaCruz, Kayla)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Peerless Hi Yield Realty Fund, LP.(DaCruz, Kayla)
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by The Fens Company, LLC.(DaCruz, Kayla)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Hybrid Capital Group, LLC.(DaCruz, Kayla)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Giuttari.(DaCruz, Kayla)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Webster Jones. JG Family Trust served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Parks, Joshua)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Webster Jones. Peerless Hi Yield Realty Fund, LP served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Parks, Joshua)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Webster Jones. The Fens Company, LLC served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Parks, Joshua)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Webster Jones. Hybrid Capital Group, LLC served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Parks, Joshua)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Webster Jones. Joseph Giuttari served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Parks, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Joseph Giuttari, Hybrid Capital Group, LLC, JG Family Trust, Peerless Hi Yield Realty Fund, LP, The Fens Company, LLC. (Kenny, Meghan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Webster Jones. (Parks, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Webster Jones. (Parks, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Webster Jones. (Parks, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Webster Jones. (Parks, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Webster Jones. (Parks, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1672381 ), filed by Webster Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Parks, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Giuttari et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Jones
Represented By: Joshua S. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Giuttari
Represented By: Andrew J. Tine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hybrid Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Tine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fens Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Tine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Hi Yield Realty Fund, LP
Represented By: Andrew J. Tine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JG Family Trust
Represented By: Andrew J. Tine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?