Briggs v. FCA USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrew P. Briggs
Defendant: FCA USA LLC, Continental Automotive Systems, INC. and John Doe Corporations 1-3
Case Number: 1:2021cv00482
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew P. Briggs. FCA USA LLC served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. (Almagno, Lawrence)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stellantis, N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA USA LLC.. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by FCA USA LLC.(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Continental Automotive Systems, INC., FCA USA LLC.. (Kenny, Meghan)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Andrew P. Briggs. (Almagno, Lawrence)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Andrew P. Briggs. (Almagno, Lawrence)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1694302 ), filed by Andrew P. Briggs.(Almagno, Lawrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kenny, Meghan).
December 7, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. FCA USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew P. Briggs
Represented By: Lawrence P. Almagno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA USA LLC
Represented By: Patrick T. Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Automotive Systems, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?