U.S. Bank National Association v. Argueta
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Defendant: Estate of Berta G. Argueta, Berta G. a and Berta Guillermina Bogran Hudson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/23/2022 at 9:30 AM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith. Zoom access information will be sent to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 23, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Rule 16 Conference held on 2/23/2022. Stefanie Howell and Patrick F. Dowling, Jr. participated. (by Zoom at 2:15 p.m.) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 2:00 PM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith. Zoom access information will be sent to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick F. Dowling, Jr. on behalf of All Defendants (Dowling, Patrick)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Estate of Berta G. Argueta.(Dowling, Patrick)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Bank National Association. All Defendants. (Pierce, Justin)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Estate of Berta G. Argueta. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Estate of Berta G. Argueta. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely in its capacity as Indenture Trustee of CIM Trust 2018-R4. (Pierce, Justin)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely in its capacity as Indenture Trustee of CIM Trust 2018-R4. (Pierce, Justin)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely in its capacity as Indenture Trustee of CIM Trust 2018-R4. (Pierce, Justin)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely in its capacity as Indenture Trustee of CIM Trust 2018-R4. (Pierce, Justin)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1703749 ), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely in its capacity as Indenture Trustee of CIM Trust 2018-R4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, Justin)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1703749 ), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely in its capacity as Indenture Trustee of CIM Trust 2018-R4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, Justin)
January 4, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 4, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Argueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Berta G. Argueta
Represented By: Patrick F. Dowling, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berta G. a
Represented By: Patrick F. Dowling, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berta Guillermina Bogran Hudson
Represented By: Patrick F. Dowling, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Justin M. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?