Parker et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper) et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Lopes Ortiz, Maria Francisco, Linda Parker, Gary Slater, Lauren Slater, Kristen Flint, Alfred Flint, Wayne H. Goodlin, James S. Dicenzo, Michael A. Ault, Daniel J. Oshea, Anthony Antonelli, Jason W. Arena, Marilyn S. Arena, Jennifer Hightower, Dennis Paquin, (fka Montufar), Ramos, Dawn M. Case, Gayle S. Amaral and on behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust and Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00060
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1.(Ankrom, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1.(Ankrom, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1.(Ankrom, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. Responsive pleading due 4/28/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/5/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. Responsive pleading due 4/28/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/5/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. Responsive pleading due 4/28/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/5/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 4/13/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 4/13/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 4/13/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 4/13/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper) answer due 3/30/2022; Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc. answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9 answer due 3/30/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5 answer due 3/30/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1 answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 answer due 3/30/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/8/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper) answer due 3/30/2022; Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc. answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9 answer due 3/30/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5 answer due 3/30/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1 answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 answer due 3/30/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/8/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper) answer due 3/30/2022; Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc. answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11 answer due 3/30/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9 answer due 3/30/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5 answer due 3/30/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1 answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS answer due 3/30/2022; Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 answer due 3/30/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/8/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9; Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corp. for Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1; Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper); Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1; Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust.. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9; Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corp. for Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1; Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper); Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1; Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust.. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9; Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corp. for Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1; Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper); Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1; Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust.. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9; Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corp. for Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1; Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper); Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1; Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust.. (Ankrom, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead; granting #5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to file Corporate Disclosure Statements up to 2/28/2022. Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc. answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9 answer due 2/28/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5 answer due 2/28/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1 answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 answer due 2/28/2022. Corporate Disclosures due 2/28/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/25/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead; granting #5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to file Corporate Disclosure Statements up to 2/28/2022. Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc. answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9 answer due 2/28/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5 answer due 2/28/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1 answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 answer due 2/28/2022. Corporate Disclosures due 2/28/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/25/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead; granting #5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to file Corporate Disclosure Statements up to 2/28/2022. Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc. answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11 answer due 2/28/2022; The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9 answer due 2/28/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5 answer due 2/28/2022; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1 answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS answer due 2/28/2022; Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1 answer due 2/28/2022. Corporate Disclosures due 2/28/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/25/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to file Corporate Disclosure Statements up to 2/28/2022 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 2/24/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to file Corporate Disclosure Statements up to 2/28/2022 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 2/24/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to file Corporate Disclosure Statements up to 2/28/2022 filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 2/24/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 2/24/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 2/24/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1. Responses due by 2/24/2022. (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2022-00032. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1718938, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS. (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Property Assessments, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadesse, Krystle)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2022-00032. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1718938, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10, Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper), The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS. (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Property Assessments, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadesse, Krystle)
February 4, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 4, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Lopes Ortiz
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Francisco
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Parker
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Slater
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Slater
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Flint
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Flint
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne H. Goodlin
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Dicenzo
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Ault
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Oshea
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Antonelli
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason W. Arena
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn S. Arena
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hightower
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Paquin
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: (fka Montufar)
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramos
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Case
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle S. Amaral
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: on behalf of themselves and all others so similarly situated
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (DBA Mr. Cooper)
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. as successor in interest to all permitted successors and assigns of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specialty Underwriting and
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA8
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-FA5
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-FA11
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates Series FHAMS 2005-AA12
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-FA3
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-C
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Holders of the Certicates, First Horizon Pass-Through Certicates series FHAMS 2005-AA9
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for First Horizon Alternative Mortgage Securities Trust 2005-AA10
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certicates, Series 2005-FM1
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Lehman Mortgage Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2007-5
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series, 2005-4XS
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee to Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certicates, Series 2006-1
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Home Equity, Inc., F/K/A American General Home Equity, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ankrom
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?