Scott M v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Scott Monta
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00080
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Case reassigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond no longer assigned to the case as the presider. (Noel, Jeannine)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Pere on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Pere, Luis)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 3/3/2022. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 3/3/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 3/3/2022. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 3/3/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 4/18/2022 to enter an appearance and either file a dispositive motion or the Certified Administrative Record which shall be deemed an answer (general denial) to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(b)(3). (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 4/18/2022 to enter an appearance and either file a dispositive motion or the Certified Administrative Record which shall be deemed an answer (general denial) to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(b)(3). (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1723984 ), filed by Scott Monta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenberg, Morris)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1723984 ), filed by Scott Monta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenberg, Morris)
February 17, 2022 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
February 17, 2022 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott M v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Monta
Represented By: Morris Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Luis A. Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?