Federal Trade Commission et al v. Lifespan Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission and State of Rhode Island
Defendant: Lifespan Corporation and Care New England Health System
Case Number: 1:2022cv00081
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission Notice of Dismissal (Musser, Susan)
February 24, 2022 HEARING CANCELLED: Chambers Conference scheduled for 2/24/2022 at 12:00 noon before District Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 23, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Daniel Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1725727 ) filed by Care New England Health System. (Procaccini, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Nicole Castle to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1725726 ) filed by Care New England Health System. (Procaccini, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifespan Corporation. (Farside, Joseph)
February 23, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Stephen Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1725722 ) filed by Care New England Health System. (Procaccini, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Care New England Health System identifying Other Affiliate The Providence Center, Inc., Other Affiliate Women & Infants Hospital, Other Affiliate Kent County Memorial Hospital, Other Affiliate Southeastern Healthcare System, Other Affiliate VNA of Care New England, Other Affiliate Care New England Ambulatory Surgery Center, Other Affiliate Integra Community Care Network, LLC, Other Affiliate Butler Hospital for Care New England Health System.. (Procaccini, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Procaccini on behalf of Care New England Health System (Procaccini, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Chambers Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 2:30 PM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith. Zoom access information will be sent to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Powers. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/23/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 23, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Chambers Conference rescheduled for 2/24/2022 at 12:00 PM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole Castle. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/23/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Wu. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/23/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Lifespan Corporation waiver sent on 2/18/2022, answer due 4/19/2022. (Musser, Susan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Care New England Health System waiver sent on 2/18/2022, answer due 4/19/2022. (Musser, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha M. Vasques on behalf of Lifespan Corporation (Vasques, Samantha)
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha M. Vasques on behalf of Lifespan Corporation (Vasques, Samantha)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/18/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/18/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for TRO. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/18/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for TRO. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/18/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle Guillory Tadesse on behalf of Lifespan Corporation (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle Guillory Tadesse on behalf of Lifespan Corporation (Tadesse, Krystle)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr. on behalf of Lifespan Corporation (Farside, Joseph)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr. on behalf of Lifespan Corporation (Farside, Joseph)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential Material filed by Federal Trade Commission. Responses due by 3/4/2022. (Musser, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential Material filed by Federal Trade Commission. Responses due by 3/4/2022. (Musser, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Temporary Restraining Order)(Musser, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Temporary Restraining Order)(Musser, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed. Notice Sent To: Federal Trade Commission, Care New England Health System, Lifespan Corporation, State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Musser, Susan) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed. Notice Sent To: Federal Trade Commission, Care New England Health System, Lifespan Corporation, State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Musser, Susan) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Care New England Health System, Lifespan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Care New England Health System, Lifespan Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Musser, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Musser, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Lifespan Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Albert Teng
Represented By: Amy Ritchie
Represented By: Anusha Sunkara
Represented By: Cathleen Williams
Represented By: Goldie Veronica Walker
Represented By: Jessica Moy
Represented By: Joshua Smith
Represented By: Kennan Khatib
Represented By: Mark Seidman
Represented By: Nathan Brenner
Represented By: Rohan Pai
Represented By: Susan Musser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Miriam Weizenbaum
Represented By: Stephen Nicholas Provazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifespan Corporation
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle Guillory Tadesse
Represented By: Samantha M. Vasques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care New England Health System
Represented By: Daniel J. Procaccini
Represented By: Daniel Powers
Represented By: Nicole Castle
Represented By: Stephen Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?