Sanchez v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniela A. Sanchez
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nations Lending Corporation and All The World
Case Number: 1:2022cv00156
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 Limited Power of Attorney by Daniela A. Sanchez (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Duplicate copy of POA, #3 Envelope)(DaCruz, Kayla)
May 12, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniela A. Sanchez. Replies due by 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kenny, Meghan)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nations Lending Corporation in support of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Bodurtha, Samuel)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nations Lending Corporation. Responses due by 5/23/2022. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Murphy on behalf of Nations Lending Corporation (Murphy, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Murphy on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Murphy, Joseph)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Reset Deadlines: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. answer due 5/9/2022; Nations Lending Corporation answer due 5/9/2022. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/18/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nations Lending Corporation. Responses due by 4/27/2022. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(DaCruz, Kayla)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 12, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nations Lending Corporation. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nations Lending Corporation. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2022-01067. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1747041, filed by Nations Lending Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Superior Court Case Summary, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PM-2022-01067. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1747041, filed by Nations Lending Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Superior Court Case Summary, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodurtha, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Joseph P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Lending Corporation
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Joseph P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All The World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?