GITSIT Solutions, LLC v. Sourivong et al
Plaintiff: GITSIT Solutions, LLC and Kondaur Capital, LLC
Defendant: Chong Sourivong and Casey Prasathane
Case Number: 1:2022cv00160
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint; Reset Deadlines: Casey Prasathane answer due 6/15/2022; Chong Sourivong answer due 6/15/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/16/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to June 15, 2022 filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/31/2022. (Ennis, John)
May 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Ennis on behalf of All Defendants (Ennis, John)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC Casey Prasathane served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Pierce, Justin)
May 3, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC Chong Sourivong served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Casey Prasathane. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Casey Prasathane. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chong Sourivong. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chong Sourivong. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1747886 ), filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1747886 ), filed by GITSIT Solutions, LLC FKA Kondaur Capital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, Justin)
April 13, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 13, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GITSIT Solutions, LLC v. Sourivong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GITSIT Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kondaur Capital, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong Sourivong
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Prasathane
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?