Blau v. Going Global LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amy Blau
Defendant: Going Global LLC, Brian Cohen and Kurt Eugenio Lopez
Case Number: 1:2022cv00171
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 15 Third Party MOTION for Discovery Renewed filed by Amy Blau. Responses due by 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Peralta, Crystal)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: the Motion for Expedited Discovery (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED in part, as it relates to the proposed Requests for Production and two depositions and DENIED in part as it relates to third parties. Ms. Blaus Motion for an Extension of Time in which to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Ms. Blau may respond no later than fourteen (14) days after completion of the limited discovery allowed in this Order. Finally, Ms. Blaus Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order for Prejudgment Writs of Attachment is DENIED. (ECF No. #9 ). So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/16/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
June 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal D. Peralta on behalf of Amy Blau (Peralta, Crystal)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: A review of the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court indicates that Attorney Crystal D. Peralta failed to renew her bar membership in accordance with LR Gen 203(c). Accordingly, she may no longer represent Amy Blau in this action and her appearance is withdrawn absent reinstatement in accordance with LR Gen 215.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/2/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE In Opposition to #8 Emergency MOTION for Discovery and Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery) filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 6/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Batastini, Armando)
May 26, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order For Prejudgment Writs of Attachment (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attachment or Temporary Restraining Order) filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit)(Batastini, Armando)
May 25, 2022 Filing 10 First RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party, or Alternatively, Transfer this Action to the District of Nevada filed by Amy Blau. Replies due by 6/1/2022. (Dolan, William)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order For Prejudgment Writs of Attachment filed by Amy Blau. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum MOL ISO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, #2 Exhibit A)(Dolan, William)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Discovery and Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Her Emergency Motion For Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery and Extension of Time to Respond, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dolan, William)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party, or Alternatively, Transfer this Action to the District of Nevada (Supplemental Affidavit of K. Lopez) by All Defendants. (Batastini, Armando)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party, or Alternatively, Transfer this Action to the District of Nevada filed by Going Global LLC. Responses due by 5/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of B. Cohen, #3 Affidavit of K. Lopez)(Batastini, Armando)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Order Entering #5 STIPULATION. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/3/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
May 3, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants answer due 5/20/2022 (Potter, Carrie)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION filed by Brian Cohen, Going Global LLC, Kurt Eugenio Lopez. (Batastini, Armando)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 State Record Part 2)(Kenny, Meghan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
April 26, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Going Global LLC. (Batastini, Armando)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Going Global LLC. (Batastini, Armando)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2022-01996. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1751410, filed by Going Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 State court complaint and summons, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Batastini, Armando)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2022-01996. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1751410, filed by Going Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 State court complaint and summons, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Batastini, Armando) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/26/2022) (Kenny, Meghan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blau v. Going Global LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Blau
Represented By: Crystal D. Peralta
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Going Global LLC
Represented By: Armando E. Batastini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Eugenio Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?