United States of America for the use of Gaspard & Morgan Construction LLC d/b/a Restoration Roofing v. Best Choice Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Gaspard & Morgan Construction LLC d/b/a Restoration Roofing and United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Gaspard & Morgan Construction, LLC doing business as Restoration Roofing
Defendant: Best Choice Construction, LLC and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00296
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America for use of Gaspard & Morgan Construction LLC d/b/a Restoration Roofing Best Choice Construction, LLC served on 8/26/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Kohm, Katharine)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Yudysky, Clark)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Yudysky, Clark)
September 13, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by United States of America Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/17/2022, answer due 9/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Fitzpatrick, David)
September 13, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (Kohm, Katharine)
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Choice Construction, LLC, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, filed by United States of America for the use of Gaspard & Morgan Construction LLC d/b/a Restoration Roofing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kohm, Katharine)
August 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1785454 ), filed by United States of America for the use of Gaspard & Morgan Construction LLC d/b/a Restoration Roofing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Kohm, Katharine)
August 12, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use of Gaspard & Morgan Construction LLC d/b/a Restoration Roofing v. Best Choice Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Gaspard & Morgan Construction LLC d/b/a Restoration Roofing
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Gaspard & Morgan Construction, LLC doing business as Restoration Roofing
Represented By: David R. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Choice Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Clark W. Yudysky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?