Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC v. Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00297
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Withdraw)(Mitchell, Daniel)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion Response re #10 Response to Motion, #11 Reply to Response filed by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/27/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #13 Response to Order to Show Cause: The Court will treat Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Response as Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment based on the administrative record before it, and all of the briefing. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/27/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-Reply filed by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2022. (Mitchell, Daniel)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Imfeld, Nathan)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The parties are to show cause on or before September 23, 2023, why the Court should not treat the filings on the Motion to Dismiss as Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment based on the administrative record before the Court, in order to allow the Court to substantively consider the merits of the appeal; Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/21/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS; Responses due by 9/9/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/19/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #10 Response to Motion, filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Weeks, Randall)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to September 9, 2022 filed by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. Replies due by 9/16/2022. (Mitchell, Daniel)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hilary Holmes Rheaume. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/2/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward J. Sackman. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/2/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Hilary Holmes Rheaume to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1791347 ) filed by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Edward J. Sackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1791333 ) filed by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to September 9, 2022 filed by Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC. Responses due by 9/15/2022. (Mitchell, Daniel)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Weeks, Randall)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Nathan D. Imfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1787500 ) filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Weeks, Randall)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Roberta F. Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1787496 ) filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Weeks, Randall)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roberta F. Howell. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/19/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathan D. Imfeld. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/19/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2022-04351. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1785504, filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed in the case being removed, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weeks, Randall)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC v. Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhode Island Truck Center, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Mitchell
Represented By: Joseph Brennan
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Represented By: Hilary Holmes Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Christian F. Capizzo
Represented By: Randall T. Weeks, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan D. Imfeld
Represented By: Roberta F. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?