Devine v. Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lori Devine
Defendant: Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00340
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Carroll, Scott)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 4/20/2023; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 5/22/2023; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/22/2023; Expert Discovery to close by 7/21/2023; Motions due by 8/21/2023;. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/20/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
October 14, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Carroll, Scott)
October 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Carroll on behalf of Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Carroll, Scott)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1795906 ), filed by Lori Devine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons)(Hurley, Ryan)
September 20, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devine v. Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Devine
Represented By: Alison M. Plunkett
Represented By: Ryan C. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott M. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?