Dimanna v. LoanDepot.com LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Dimanna
Defendant: LoanDepot.com LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00396
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leslie Dimanna. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
December 22, 2022 Filing 20 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 1/5/2023. (Daley, Wm)
December 22, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanDepot.com LLC identifying Corporate Parent loanDepot, Inc., Corporate Parent LD Holdings Group LLC for loanDepot.com, LLC for LoanDepot.com LLC.. (Stein, Callan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by LoanDepot.com LLC.(Stein, Callan)
December 5, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service. by Trans Union, LLC.(Archetto, Daniel)
December 5, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC. (Archetto, Daniel)
December 5, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for William M. Huse to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Service. ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1818861 ) filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Archetto, Daniel)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William M. Huse. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/5/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
December 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Archetto on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Archetto, Daniel)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #13 Stipulation extending time for loanDepot.com, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's complaint; LoanDepot.com LLC answer due 12/28/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/1/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 30, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION extending time for loanDepot.com, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's complaint filed by Leslie Dimanna. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint; Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 12/28/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/29/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Responses due by 12/12/2022. (Daley, Wm)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie Dimanna. Trans Union, LLC served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie Dimanna. LoanDepot.com LLC served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie Dimanna. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION for Yitzchak Zelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1811861 ) filed by Leslie Dimanna. (Shealy, Elizabeth) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/10/2022) (DaCruz, Kayla).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yitzchak Zelman. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/10/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
November 2, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 2, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Leslie Dimanna. (Shealy, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Leslie Dimanna. (Shealy, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Leslie Dimanna. (Shealy, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Leslie Dimanna. (Shealy, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1809429 ), filed by Leslie Dimanna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shealy, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimanna v. LoanDepot.com LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Dimanna
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Shealy
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanDepot.com LLC
Represented By: Callan G. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Archetto
Represented By: William M. Huse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Wm Maxwell Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?