United States of America et al v. Aerosols Danville, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Rhode Island Department of Environmental Management
Defendant: Aerosols Danville, Inc., Clean Harbors of Braintree, Inc., Electric Boat Corporation, NSTAR Electric Company, OCG Microelectronics Materials, Inc., KIK Custom Products, Inc, Avnet, Inc., Ballantyne Legacy Holdings, LLC, Bixby International Corporation, Recycling Industries, Inc., Corning Incorporated, General Dynamics Corporation, Life Technologies Corporation, Boston Edison Company, Olin Hunt Specialty Products, Inc., Philip A. Hunt Chemical Corp., Stanley Black and Decker Inc., Waste Management of Massachusetts, Inc. and Waste Management of Rhode Island, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00405
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Motion to Enter Consent Decree filed by United States of America. Responses due by 1/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Consented-To Motion to Enter Consent Decree)(Bowen, Mae)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Avnet, Inc. Summons, #2 Ballantyne Legacy Holdings, LLC Summons, #3 Bixby International Corporation Summons, #4 Clean Harbors of Braintree, Inc. Summons, #5 Corning Incorporated Summons, #6 Electric Boat Corporation Summons, #7 Life Technologies Corporation Summons, #8 NSTAR Electric Company Summons, #9 OCG Microelectronics Materials, Inc. Summons, #10 Stanley Black and Decker, Inc. Summons, #11 Waste Management of Massachusetts, Inc. Summons, #12 Waste Management of Rhode Island, Inc. Summons)(Bowen, Mae)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina A. Hoefsmit on behalf of Rhode Island Department of Environmental Management (Hoefsmit, Christina)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Lodging Consent Decree (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree)(Bowen, Mae)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Rhode Island Department of Environmental Management, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Aerosols Danville, Inc., #3 Summons-Avnet, Inc., #4 Summons-Ballantyne Legacy Holdings, LLC, #5 Summons-Bixby International Corporation, #6 Summons-Clean Harbors of Braintree, Inc., #7 Summons-Corning Incorporated, #8 Summons-Electric Boat Corporation, #9 Summons-Life Technologies Corporation, #10 Summons-NSTAR Electric Company, #11 Summons-OCG Microelectronics Materials, Inc., #12 Summons- Stanley Black and Decker, Inc., #13 Summons-Waste Management of Massachusetts, Inc., #14 Summons- Waste Management of Rhode Island, Inc.)(Bowen, Mae)
November 9, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Aerosols Danville, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerosols Danville, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors of Braintree, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Boat Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSTAR Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCG Microelectronics Materials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIK Custom Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avnet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballantyne Legacy Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bixby International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recycling Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Edison Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olin Hunt Specialty Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip A. Hunt Chemical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black and Decker Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of Massachusetts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of Rhode Island, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mae Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhode Island Department of Environmental Management
Represented By: Christina A. Hoefsmit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?