Campion v. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Simon D. Campion
Defendant: Axiom Product Administration Inc., Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc. doing business as Paul Miller Porsche, Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC, Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC, Axiom Product Administration LLC and Wesco Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00410
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 33 REPLY to Response re #32 Response to Motion to Remove Default and Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Late filed by Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC, Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC, Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Ledoux, Esq., #2 Affidavit of David Smith, #3 Affidavit of Audrey Bradley, Esq., #4 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint)(Bradley, Audrey)
January 9, 2023 Filing 32 RESPONSE In Opposition to #30 MOTION to Set Aside Default and File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Late filed by Simon D. Campion. Replies due by 1/17/2023. (Gladstone, Bruce)
January 3, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie L. Christensen on behalf of Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC, Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC, Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc. (Christensen, Laurie)
December 27, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION to Set Aside Default and File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Late filed by Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC, Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC, Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc.. Responses due by 1/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bradley, Audrey)
December 27, 2022 Filing 29 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC, Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC, Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc. (Kenny, Meghan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey L. Bradley on behalf of Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC, Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC, Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc. (Bradley, Audrey)
December 21, 2022 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Simon D. Campion as to Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Application for Entry of Default Against Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, #2 Exhibit 1)(Pimentel, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Simon D. Campion as to Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Application for Entry of Default Against Paul Miller Auto Group, #2 Exhibit 1)(Pimentel, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Simon D. Campion as to Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Application for Entry of Default Against Paul Miller Sportscars, #2 Exhibit 1)(Pimentel, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Matthew Gibbons on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (Gibbons, Brian)
December 16, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Porsche Enterprises Incorperated, Corporate Parent Porsche Nordamerika Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent PPF Holding AG, Corporate Parent Dr. Ing h.c. F. Porsche AG, Corporate Parent Porsche Holding Stuttgart GmbH, Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Porsche Cars North America, Inc... (Sbarra, Anthony)
December 15, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE In Opposition to #15 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Simon D. Campion. Replies due by 12/22/2022. (Gladstone, Bruce)
December 13, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of Axiom Product Administration Inc. (Fine, Robert)
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre S. Digou on behalf of Axiom Product Administration Inc., Wesco Insurance Company (Digou, Andre)
December 13, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION Regarding Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Axiom Product Administration Inc., Wesco Insurance Company. (Emanuel, Douglas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wesco Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Wesco Insurance Company.. (Emanuel, Douglas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Axiom Product Administration Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rotterdam Holdings North America LLC for Axiom Product Administration Inc... (Emanuel, Douglas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Emanuel on behalf of Axiom Product Administration Inc., Wesco Insurance Company (Emanuel, Douglas)
December 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. Responses due by 12/20/2022. (Sbarra, Anthony)
December 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Sbarra, Jr on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (Sbarra, Anthony)
December 1, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simon D. Campion. Axiom Product Administration Inc. served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Gladstone, Bruce)
December 1, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simon D. Campion. Wesco Insurance Company served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Gladstone, Bruce)
December 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simon D. Campion. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. served on 11/21/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Gladstone, Bruce)
December 1, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Simon D. Campion for Summons and Complaint Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC served on 11/25/2022, answer due 12/16/2022; Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC served on 11/25/2022, answer due 12/16/2022; Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc. served on 11/25/2022, answer due 12/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Gladstone, Bruce)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc. Summons, #2 Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC Summons, #3 Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC Summons, #4 Axiom Product Administration Inc. Summons, #5 Wesco Insurance Company Summons)(DaCruz, Kayla)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by Simon D. Campion. (Gladstone, Bruce)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Simon D. Campion. (Gladstone, Bruce)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Simon D. Campion. (Gladstone, Bruce)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Simon D. Campion. (Gladstone, Bruce)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Simon D. Campion. (Gladstone, Bruce)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Simon D. Campion. (Gladstone, Bruce)
November 16, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
November 16, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1813294 ), filed by Simon D. Campion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gladstone, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campion v. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiom Product Administration Inc.
Represented By: Andre S. Digou
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Sbarra, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Matthew Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Miller Sportscars, Inc. doing business as Paul Miller Porsche
Represented By: Audrey L. Bradley
Represented By: Laurie L. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Miller Auto Group, LLC
Represented By: Audrey L. Bradley
Represented By: Laurie L. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Miller Pre-Owned Center, LLC
Represented By: Audrey L. Bradley
Represented By: Laurie L. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiom Product Administration LLC
Represented By: Andre S. Digou
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: Andre S. Digou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon D. Campion
Represented By: Bruce W. Gladstone
Represented By: Matthew J. Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?