Murray v. Universal Protection Service, LLC
Plaintiff: Dennis Murray
Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC doing business as Allied Universal Security Services
Case Number: 1:2022cv00417
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Evan S. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1825403 ) filed by Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Shea, Carson)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal Protection Service, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allied Ontario LP for Universal Protection Service, LLC.. (Shea, Carson)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan S. Weiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/22/2022. (Kenny, Meghan)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service by Universal Protection Service, LLC.(Shea, Carson)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Murray. Universal Protection Service, LLC served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Pushee, Michael)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Kenny, Meghan)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Dennis Murray. (Pushee, Michael)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1814793 ), filed by Dennis Murray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pushee, Michael)
November 21, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Universal Protection Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Murray
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC doing business as Allied Universal Security Services
Represented By: Carson M. Shea
Represented By: Evan S. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?