Velasquez v. Morales et al
Plaintiff: Diego Velasquez
Defendant: Juan Morales, Daniel Rivera, Xavier Perez, Diego Sanchez, To-jo-mar, FOGO and Sogo
Case Number: 1:2022cv00457
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendations, denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and DISMISSING Case. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/18/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations filed by Diego Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Email)(DaCruz, Kayla)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. District Judge Mary S. McElroy recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/10/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Diego Velasquez Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2023.. I recommend that Plaintiffs complaint be summarily DISMISSED without prejudice because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction and/or, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), be DISMISSED with prejudice because the pleading fails to state a claim and is malicious. I further recommend that Plaintiff's IFP motion be denied as moot. Finally, I hereby caution Plaintiff that the pattern of filing established by these three complaints puts him at risk that the Court will enjoin him from initiating any new civil action, except with the prior approval of the Chief Judge of this District. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/9/2023. (Saucier, Martha)
January 5, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Diego Velasquez. (Kenny, Meghan)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Diego Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: To-jo-mar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sogo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?