Ponte et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte and Ponte Investments, LLC
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Company, Independence Bank and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00018
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Set/Reset Deadlines: 31] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Responses due by 3/13/2023, Replies due by 3/15/2023.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/8/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
March 7, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. Responses due by 3/21/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
March 7, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing reset for 3/17/2023 at 03:30 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 255 2477, Passcode: 214956) (Potter, Carrie)
March 1, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 3/15/2023. (Bond, Erik)
February 28, 2023 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John C. Ponte, Greenwich Business Capital.(Potter, Carrie)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER : Motion to Dismiss due 3/1/2023, Response due 3/10/2023 and Replies due 3/15/2023. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/28/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
February 28, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: Motion for TRO and Motion to Dismiss set for 3/17/2023 at 02:00 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 255 2477, Passcode: 214956) (Potter, Carrie)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend/Correct. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/28/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
February 28, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: In Chambers Conference held on 2/28/2023: R. Corrente, C. Mulhearn, T. McDermott and E. Bond in attendance. (Courtroom Remote Conference at 9:30 am.) (Potter, Carrie)
February 27, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J. McDermott on behalf of Independence Bank (McDermott, Travis)
February 27, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference reset for 2/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy. PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE (Zoom Meeting ID: 160 492 9521, Passcode: 864792) (Potter, Carrie)
February 27, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference re: ECF #26 Motion for TRO set for 2/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 492 9521, Passcode: 864792) (Potter, Carrie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE In Opposition to #26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 3/3/2023. (Bond, Erik)
February 23, 2023 Filing 27 DECLARATION of John C. Ponte by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
February 23, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
February 22, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte re #21 Notice (Other), . (Mulhearn, Christopher)
February 22, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. Responses due by 3/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
February 22, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Ponte, Greenwich Business Capital. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
February 16, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Mary S. McElroy: In Chambers Conference held on 2/16/2023: R. Corrente, C. Mulhearn and E. Bond in attendance. (Courtroom Remote Conference at 11:00 am.) (Potter, Carrie)
February 15, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE In Opposition to #15 MOTION for Relief from Text Order Granting FDIC's Motions re: Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion to Stay, and Notice of Withdrawal of Administrative Subpoena filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 2/22/2023. (Bond, Erik)
February 15, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re #10 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Administrative Subpoena and Response to Motion to Quash, #3 MOTION for Protective Order & to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum -- Withdrawal of Administrative Subpoena (Bond, Erik)
February 15, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clark Corrente on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Corrente, Robert)
February 14, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference set for 2/16/2023 at 11:00 AM via Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 855 5892, Passcode: 216952) (Potter, Carrie)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Set/Reset deadlines: #10 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Administrative Subpoena - Responses due by 3/1/2023. ; #9 Response to Motion, - Replies due by 3/1/2023.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/3/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
February 2, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #17 Response to Motion, for Extension of Time filed by John C. Ponte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
February 2, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION for an Extension of Time Time to Reply to M-Quash & Cross Petition to Enforce filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 2/9/2023. (Bond, Erik)
February 1, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for an Extension of Time Time to Reply to M-Quash & Cross Petition to Enforce filed by John C. Ponte. Responses due by 2/15/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
February 1, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Relief from Text Order Granting FDIC's Motions re: Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion to Stay, filed by John C. Ponte. Responses due by 2/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 4)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The defendant, FDIC's, Motions for a Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery (ECF Nos. #13 and #14 ) are GRANTED. Discovery in this matter, which is premature, is STAYED until the Court has decided the FDIC's expected motion to dismiss concerning this Courts subject matter jurisdiction. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/31/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
January 30, 2023 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #13 MOTION for Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 2/13/2023. (Bond, Erik)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bond, Erik)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Set/Reset Deadlines: #10 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Responses due by 2/3/2023., #3 MOTION for Protective Order Replies due by 2/3/2023.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/26/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
January 25, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 24, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Administrative Subpoena and Response to Motion to Quash, #9 Response to Motion, filed by John C. Ponte. Responses due by 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Administrative Subpoena and Response to Motion to Quash filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 2/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Bond, Erik)
January 20, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Opposition to #3 MOTION for Protective Order & to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum and Cross Petition to Enforce Subpoena filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Bond, Erik)
January 16, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Ponte, Greenwich Business Capital. Independence Bank served on 1/13/2023, answer due 2/3/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik B. Bond on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Bond, Erik)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Kenny, Meghan)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER. The defendant, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, shall respond to the plaintiff, John C. Ponte's, Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum (ECF No. #3 ), within seven (7) days of this Order. The Court will thereafter determine whether the plaintiff is entitled to the relief he seeks, including whether he should not be compelled to testify. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/13/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
January 12, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order & to Quash Subpoena Ad Testificandum filed by Greenwich Business Capital, John C. Ponte. Responses due by 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1830897 ), filed by John C. Ponte, Greenwich Business Capital. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
January 12, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponte et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenwich Business Capital
Represented By: Christopher M. Mulhearn
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Ponte
Represented By: Christopher M. Mulhearn
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ponte Investments, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Mulhearn
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence Bank
Represented By: Travis J. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Erik B. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?