South Shore Village Condo Assoc. et al v. Ritz-Craft Corporation of PA, Inc.
Plaintiff: South Shore Village Condo Assoc., Envine LLC, Stuart Hershman, Ann-Marie Hershman, Bill Nelle, Lauri Nelle, Andy Scoppetti, Elaine Scoppetti, Tom Elder, Nora Elder, David Lubanko, Margery Lubanko, Thomas Tamayo, Theresa Tamayo, Pat Gillespie, Maryann Gillespie, Jim Kiernan, Carol Kiernan, Kathy Mis, Jim Kittelson, Jackie Kittelson, Gary Smith, Judy Smith, Jeanne Rodrigues, Kevin Beasley, Mary Beasley, Frank Kowal and Cheryl Kowal
Defendant: Ritz-Craft Corporation of PA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00118
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Lubanko, Jackie Kittelson, Andy Scoppetti, Mary Beasley, Jim Kiernan, Envine LLC, Gary Smith, South Shore Village Condo Assoc., Carol Kiernan, Thomas Tamayo, Judy Smith, Maryann Gillespie, Lauri Nelle, Kevin Beasley, Frank Kowal, Cheryl Kowal, Stuart Hershman, Tom Elder, Margery Lubanko, Theresa Tamayo, Pat Gillespie, Jim Kittelson, Elaine Scoppetti, Ann-Marie Hershman, Jeanne Rodrigues, Kathy Mis, Nora Elder, Bill Nelle. Ritz-Craft Corporation of PA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Rome, Judah)
March 28, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by South Shore Village Condo Assoc.. (Rome, Judah)
March 28, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Envine LLC. (Rome, Judah)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Kenny, Meghan)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Kevin Beasley, Mary Beasley, Nora Elder, Tom Elder, Envine LLC, Maryann Gillespie, Pat Gillespie, Ann-Marie Hershman, Stuart Hershman, Carol Kiernan, Jim Kiernan, Jackie Kittelson, Jim Kittelson, Cheryl Kowal, Frank Kowal, David Lubanko, Margery Lubanko, Kathy Mis, Bill Nelle, Lauri Nelle, Jeanne Rodrigues, Andy Scoppetti, Elaine Scoppetti, Gary Smith, Judy Smith, South Shore Village Condo Assoc., Theresa Tamayo, Thomas Tamayo. (Rome, Judah)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Judah H. Rome on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rome, Judah)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1853921 ), filed by David Lubanko, Jackie Kittelson, Mary Beasley, Jim Kiernan, Envine LLC, Carol Kiernan, Maryann Gillespie, Lauri Nelle, Kevin Beasley, Frank Kowal, Cheryl Kowal, Stuart Hershman, Tom Elder, Margery Lubanko, Pat Gillespie, Jim Kittelson, Ann-Marie Hershman, Kathy Mis, Nora Elder, Bill Nelle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, John)
March 24, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Shore Village Condo Assoc. et al v. Ritz-Craft Corporation of PA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Shore Village Condo Assoc.
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Envine LLC
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Hershman
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann-Marie Hershman
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Nelle
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Nelle
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Scoppetti
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Scoppetti
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Elder
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Elder
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lubanko
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margery Lubanko
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tamayo
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Tamayo
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Gillespie
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Gillespie
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Kiernan
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kiernan
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Mis
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Kittelson
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Kittelson
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Smith
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Smith
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Rodrigues
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Beasley
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beasley
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Kowal
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kowal
Represented By: Judah H. Rome
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritz-Craft Corporation of PA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?