Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00206
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2023; Factual Discovery to be completed by 1/15/2024; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 2/15/2024; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 3/17/2024; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 4/17/2024; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/17/2024. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/13/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 16, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Andrew D. Black to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1882668 ) filed by Broan-Nutone LLC. (Procopio, Steven) (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/21/2023) (McGuire, Vickie).
June 16, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Christopher A. Duggan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1882662 ) filed by Broan-Nutone LLC. (Procopio, Steven) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/21/2023) (McGuire, Vickie).
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Duggan. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/16/2023. (Kenny, Meghan)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. Black. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/16/2023. (Kenny, Meghan)
June 15, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Paul R. Bartolacci to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1882216 ) filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul R. Bartolacci. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/15/2023. (Kenny, Meghan)
June 13, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broan-Nutone LLC. (Procopio, Steven)
June 13, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Broan-Nutone LLC.(Procopio, Steven)
May 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Broan-Nutone LLC. (DaCruz, Kayla)
May 16, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company.. (Lyons, Thomas)
May 16, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Lyons, Thomas)
May 16, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1872309 ), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Thomas)
May 16, 2023 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Represented By: Paul R. Bartolacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Black
Represented By: Christopher A. Duggan
Represented By: Steven Procopio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?