Michelle C. v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Michelle Cochrane
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2023cv00230
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Mary S McElroy
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Pere on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Pere, Luis)
July 27, 2023 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 9/25/2023 to enter an appearance and answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Rule 4 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (DaCruz, Kayla)
July 27, 2023 NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. # Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 8/10/2023. (DaCruz, Kayla)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/27/2023. (Saucier, Martha)
July 25, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
June 5, 2023 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michelle Cochrane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Spunzo, David)
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Michelle Cochrane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spunzo, David)
June 5, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelle C. v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cochrane
Represented By: David F. Spunzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Luis A. Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?