Carr et al v. Barton Gilman LLP et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Carr and Core Healing Therapy
Defendant: Barton Gilman LLP, All implicated therein, Rui Alves and Brittney Garvey
Case Number: 1:2023cv00369
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 Letter sent to Daniel Carr requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Simoncelli, Michael)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER adopting in full and without objection Magistrate Judge Almond's #5 Report and Recommendation ("R&R"). The thirty-day deadline set in the R&R regarding representation of Plaintiff Daniel Carr's minor son and Carr's business, Plaintiff Core Healing Therapy, has expired without compliance. Therefore, for the reasons stated in the R&R, the claims purportedly brought on behalf of Carr's minor son and Plaintiff Core Healing Therapy are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. See R&R 1-2 (citing Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c); LR Gen 205(a)). Plaintiff Carr may proceed IFP with his remaining claims. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/19/2023. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) AND ORDER - Giving due deference to Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court will GRANT Plaintiff thirty days from the date of this Report and Recommendation for counsel to appear in this case on behalf of his son and/or business, and to show that he has the legal authority to sue on his minor son's behalf. If counsel does not enter an appearance within thirty days, the Court recommends that the claims purportedly asserted by Plaintiff's son and Core Healing Therapy be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the reasons discussed and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Carr, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Carr ( Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2023.). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/12/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 6, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 request for Subpoena Duces Tecum, by Daniel Carr. (Kenny, Meghan)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Carr. (Kenny, Meghan) Modified on 9/6/2023 (Urizandi, Nissheneyra).
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Daniel Carr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Kenny, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr et al v. Barton Gilman LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core Healing Therapy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton Gilman LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All implicated therein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rui Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?