Sarkisian v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melissa Sarkisian
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00385
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Case filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Responses due by 10/30/2023. (Moretta, John)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc... (Moretta, John)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Moretta on behalf of All Defendants (Moretta, John)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/16/2023. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melissa Sarkisian. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Berg, Andrew)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 18, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1910240 ), filed by Melissa Sarkisian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Berg, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarkisian v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Sarkisian
Represented By: Andrew H. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Moretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?