Lynch v. Trek Bicycle Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Lynch
Defendant: Trek Bicycle Corporation and Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2024cv00043
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2024 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Shimano, Inc., Corporate Parent Shimano, Inc. for Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated.. (Ruggieri, James)
March 21, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated.(Ruggieri, James)
March 15, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Emily A. Constantine to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1974172 ) filed by Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Benjamin, Nicole)
March 15, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for David J. Turek to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1974170 ) filed by Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Benjamin, Nicole)
March 15, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Benjamin, Nicole)
March 15, 2024 Filing 11 Defendant Trek Bicycle Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Trek Bicycle Corporation.(Benjamin, Nicole)
March 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Benjamin on behalf of Trek Bicycle Corporation (Benjamin, Nicole)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Turek. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/15/2024. (Hill, Cherelle)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily A. Constantine. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/15/2024. (Hill, Cherelle)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint; Reset Deadlines: Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated answer due 3/21/2024. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/13/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 12, 2024 Filing 9 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated. Responses due by 3/26/2024. (Ruggieri, James)
February 27, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Lynch. Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated served on 2/22/2024, answer due 3/14/2024. (Combies, Adam)
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Lynch. Trek Bicycle Corporation served on 2/23/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. (Combies, Adam)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated, Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hill, Cherelle) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/22/2024) (Hill, Cherelle).
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Timothy Lynch. (Combies, Adam)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Timothy Lynch. (Combies, Adam)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P.H. Michaud on behalf of Timothy Lynch (Michaud, Jonathan)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-1958106 ), filed by Timothy Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Combies, Adam) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/29/2024) (Hill, Cherelle).
January 29, 2024 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Trek Bicycle Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Lynch
Represented By: Adam J. Combies
Represented By: Jonathan P.H. Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trek Bicycle Corporation
Represented By: Nicole J. Benjamin
Represented By: David J. Turek
Represented By: Emily A. Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shimano North American Holding, Incorporated
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?