Haworth v. Twins Pizza, Inc.
Plaintiff: Helen Haworth
Defendant: Twins Pizza, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00472
Filed: November 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Twins Pizza, Inc.. Responses due by 1/24/2025. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Strike. Defendant shall file a response to the complaint through an attorney on or before January 13, 2025. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/30/2024. (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 9, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #5 Answer to Complaint filed by Helen Haworth. Responses due by 12/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pushee, Michael)
December 9, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Twins Pizza, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Hill, Cherelle)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Haworth. Twins Pizza, Inc. served on 11/18/2024, answer due 12/9/2024. (Pushee, Michael) CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited 11/22/2024 to modify the service date and answer date.(Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
November 13, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Twins Pizza, Inc. (Hill, Cherelle)
November 13, 2024 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
November 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2065560 ), filed by Helen Haworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Pushee, Michael)
November 13, 2024 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haworth v. Twins Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Haworth
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twins Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?