B.D v. Slice and Scoop Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B.D
Defendant: Slice and Scoop Inc., Fadi El Ammar, "JAZ" LNU and Danny Abounajem
Case Number: 1:2024cv00484
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Set/reset deadlines: Answers due by 2/3/2025. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/16/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
December 9, 2024 Filing 8 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/23/2024. (Sylvia, Jennifer)
December 9, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Slice and Scoop Inc.. (Sylvia, Jennifer)
December 9, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Sylvia on behalf of All Defendants (Sylvia, Jennifer)
November 26, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Slice and Scoop Inc. (Hill, Cherelle)
November 26, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by B.D. (Spunzo, David)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Danny Abounajem, Fadi El Ammar, Slice and Scoop Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Hill, Cherelle)
November 19, 2024 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2068097 ), filed by RAYMOND DUQUETTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Spunzo, David)
November 19, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.D v. Slice and Scoop Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.D
Represented By: David F. Spunzo
Represented By: Richard W. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slice and Scoop Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Sylvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fadi El Ammar
Represented By: Jennifer L. Sylvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "JAZ" LNU
Represented By: Jennifer L. Sylvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Abounajem
Represented By: Jennifer L. Sylvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?