Francis v. Tails N' Trails LLC
Plaintiff: Jean Francis
Defendant: Tails N' Trails LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00525
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Melissa R DuBose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 2/21/2025 at 10:00 AM by Remote Hearing before District Judge Melissa R. DuBose. This is a non-public conference.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 342 4547, Passcode: 983597) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Tails N' Trails LLC.(Daley, Kevin)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Melissa R. DuBose for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/27/2025. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jean Francis. Tails N' Trails LLC served on 1/9/2025, answer due 1/30/2025. (Oduyingbo, Olayiwola)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tails N' Trails LLC. (Hill, Cherelle)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2077402 ), filed by Jean Francis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons_Tails N' Trails)(Oduyingbo, Olayiwola)
December 16, 2024 Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Tails N' Trails LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tails N' Trails LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Francis
Represented By: Olayiwola O. Oduyingbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?