Price v. Cumberland Farms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Price
Defendant: Cumberland Farms, Inc. and Shiftsmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00065
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Melissa R DuBose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE by Daniel Price of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Oduyingbo, Olayiwola)
April 2, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2025. (Attachments: #1 Zicchino Declaration, #2 Aguirre Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Guilmartin, Cullen)
April 2, 2025 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EG Retail (America), LLC for Cumberland Farms, Inc... (Guilmartin, Cullen)
April 2, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for Mona Z. Hanna to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2118026 ) filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc.. (Guilmartin, Cullen)
April 2, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION for Allison C. Aguirre to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2118021 ) filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc.. (Guilmartin, Cullen)
April 2, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION for Marc R. Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2117999 ) filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc.. (Guilmartin, Cullen)
April 2, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc R. Jacobs. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 4/2/2025. (Hill, Cherelle)
April 2, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison C. Aguirre. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 4/2/2025. (Hill, Cherelle)
April 2, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mona Z. Hanna. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 4/2/2025. (Hill, Cherelle)
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cumberland Farms, Inc. answer due 4/2/2025; Shiftsmart, Inc. answer due 4/2/2025. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 3/24/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
March 11, 2025 Filing 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc.. Responses due by 3/25/2025. (Guilmartin, Cullen)
March 11, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cullen W. Guilmartin on behalf of Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc. (Guilmartin, Cullen)
February 28, 2025 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Daniel Price for Summons and Complaint Shiftsmart, Inc. served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Oduyingbo, Olayiwola)
February 28, 2025 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Daniel Price for Summons and Complaint Cumberland Farms, Inc. served on 2/26/2025, answer due 3/19/2025. (Oduyingbo, Olayiwola)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shiftsmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Shiftsmart, Inc.) (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
February 19, 2025 Case assigned to District Judge Melissa R. DuBose and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2100426 ), filed by Daniel Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Cumberland, #3 Proposed Summons - Shiftsmart)(Oduyingbo, Olayiwola)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Cumberland Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Price
Represented By: Olayiwola O. Oduyingbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mona Z. Hanna
Represented By: Marc R. Jacobs
Represented By: Cullen W. Guilmartin
Represented By: Allison C. Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiftsmart, Inc.
Represented By: Mona Z. Hanna
Represented By: Marc R. Jacobs
Represented By: Cullen W. Guilmartin
Represented By: Allison C. Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?